Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David Hall, filed a(n) case against Johnathan R Ybarra, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts with John N. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn N. Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
ORDER: Extending Time for Service
Date: January 16, 2015SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: March 10, 2014NOTICE: Impending Dismissal
Date: November 26, 2014NOTICE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 19, 2015MOTION: Extend Time for Service
Date: January 14, 2015ORDER: Extending Time for Service
Date: January 23, 2015ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: March 11, 2014SERVICE: Attempted Service
Date: June 27, 2014COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: March 10, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.