Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vion Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Cv case against Donnie L Davis, Rachel Davis, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON LARRY KENWORTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON LARRY KENWORTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2013 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
Order: Release of Garnishment
Date: February 09, 2020ORDER: Order
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00APPLICATION: FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00ANSWER: OF GARNISHEE
Date: June 05, 2018PETITION: Petition
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: April 29, 2021PETITION: Petition
Date: January 30, 2020JUDGMENT: TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT
Date: 2013-08-01T00:00:00ANSWER: OF GARNISHEE
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00APPLICATION: FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: January 30, 2020NOTICE: CHANGE OF FIRM / ADDRESS
Date: February 16, 2022Notice: Compliance
Date: May 29, 2018PETITION: Petition
Date: June 04, 2018ORDER: Order
Date: June 07, 2018APPLICATION: FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: December 17, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.