Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Cv case against J Doe Anderson, Shirley A Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Yavapai County, AZ, . Yavapai County, AZ Superior Courts Yavapai County Superior with MICHAEL MCGILL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYavapai County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYavapai County Superior |
COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00STATEMENT: of Costs
Date: March 17, 2021MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: March 17, 2021STIPULATION: STIPULATION
Date: April 23, 2021SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00JUDGMENT: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 09, 2022ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00REQUEST: Request
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00MOTION: SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2021ORDER: Order
Date: March 25, 2021ORDER: TRANSFERRING CASE TO ARBITRATION
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 17, 2021JUDGMENT: Judgment
Date: April 26, 2021ARBITRATION: Notice of Appointment of Civil Arbitrator
Date: March 31, 2021ARBITRATION: Notice of Appointment of Civil Arbitrator
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00STATEMENT: of Facts
Date: March 17, 2021MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.