Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fabian Garcia, filed a(n) Cv case against Temporal Investments Llc An Arizona Limited Liability Company, Fred Moreno, Temporal Investments, Llc An Arizona Limited Liability Company, Rosalie Lee, Roy Lee, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County, AZ, . Santa Cruz County, AZ Superior Courts Santa Cruz County Superior with LILIANA ORTEGA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLILIANA ORTEGA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2022 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Cruz County Superior |
SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 19, 2022SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: January 18, 2022APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: February 15, 2022ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: January 19, 2022SERVICE: WAIVER OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2022SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 20, 2022ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: March 01, 2022ANSWER: AND COUNTERCLAIM
Date: March 15, 2022COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: January 18, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.