Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lobel Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Cv case against Tara Ann Nicole Hyde, in the jurisdiction of Pinal County, AZ, . Pinal County, AZ Superior Courts Pinal County Superior with THE HON DANIEL A WASHBURN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2016 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPinal County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HousePinal County Superior |
WRIT: RETURN OF WRIT
Date: November 17, 2016NOTICE: RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT
Date: November 08, 2017WRIT: RETURN OF WRIT
Date: October 26, 2017MISCELLANEOUS: Information Sheet
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00ANSWER: OF GARNISHEE
Date: November 18, 2016APPLICATION: CONTINUING LIEN
Date: December 06, 2016SERVICE: Certificate
Date: October 26, 2017APPLICATION: FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 03, 2017APPLICATION: FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 28, 2016JUDGMENT: TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: November 17, 2016ORDER: Continuing Lien
Date: December 21, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.