Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Regional Acceptance Corp, filed a(n) C case against Lisa Marie Ybarra, Mario S Ybarra, in the jurisdiction of Pima County, AZ, . Pima County, AZ Superior Courts Pima County Superior with JEFFREY BERGIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryC |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPima County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HousePima County Superior |
Application For Writ
Date: February 17, 2021Order
Date: January 05, 2021Certificate Of Service
Date: March 15, 2021Statement Of Cost
Date: March 19, 2021Exhibits
Date: November 11, 2020Order
Date: March 26, 2021Order
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Exhibits
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Application
Date: March 19, 2021Notice
Date: April 05, 2021Statement
Date: 2020-11-11T00:00:00Notice Of Impending Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Summons/Subpoena
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Petition & Complaint
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Fastar Certificate
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00All Money Receipts
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Request
Date: 2020-11-11T00:00:00Certificate Of Service
Date: March 17, 2021Application
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2020-11-11T00:00:00Documents/Records Filed
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Answer/Response To Garnishment/Garnishee
Date: March 15, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.