Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shanika Smith, filed a(n) C case against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Pima County, AZ, . Pima County, AZ Superior Courts Pima County Superior with JEFFREY BERGIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2020 |
CategoryC |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPima County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HousePima County Superior |
Petition & Complaint
Date: March 27, 2020Certificate Of Service
Date: April 21, 2020Order
Date: July 17, 2020All Money Receipts
Date: June 22, 2020Summons/Subpoena
Date: March 27, 2020Documents/Records Filed
Date: March 27, 2020Fastar Certificate
Date: March 27, 2020Notice
Date: June 22, 2020All Money Receipts
Date: March 27, 2020Stipulation To Dismiss
Date: July 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.