Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding Llc, Toni H Harper, filed a(n) C case in the jurisdiction of Pima County, AZ, . Pima County, AZ Superior Courts Pima County Superior with RICHARD GORDON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2017 |
CategoryC |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPima County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HousePima County Superior |
Misc
Date: July 13, 2017Order
Date: May 26, 2017Petition & Complaint
Date: May 19, 2017Certificate Of Service
Date: June 23, 2017Exhibits
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Petitions
Date: June 27, 2017Notice
Date: July 10, 2017Exhibits
Date: July 10, 2017All Money Receipts
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Documents/Records Filed
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Order Approving/Approved
Date: July 11, 2017Exhibits
Date: June 23, 2017Change Of Address Form
Date: June 27, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.