Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cordova, Joanna Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cordova, Samuel Vasquez, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Denied | |
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.