Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Velocity Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Cv case against J Doe Spouse, Misti Schubel, in the jurisdiction of Navajo County, AZ, . Navajo County, AZ Superior Courts Navajo County Superior with RALPH HATCH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2020 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNavajo County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseNavajo County Superior |
MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: November 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT: IN SUPPORT OF
Date: November 05, 2020SERVICE: Return of Service
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00APPLICATION: APPLICATION
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE: Notice
Date: November 20, 2020ORDER: Resetting
Date: December 24, 2020STATEMENT: of Costs
Date: November 05, 2020SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00MOTION: Judgment on Pleadings
Date: November 05, 2020JUDGMENT: Default
Date: December 29, 2020NOTICE: Notice
Date: November 23, 2020MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00NOTICE: JUDGMENT LODGED
Date: December 04, 2020ORDER: SETTING
Date: December 02, 2020COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.