Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tulsa County, OK, . Tulsa County, OK Superior Courts with Jesse S. Harris presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTulsa County, OK |
|
ORDER APPROVING CONTINGENCY FEE CONTRACT WITH COUNSEL FOR SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR
Date: April 09, 2012AUTHORIZATION - TRACY STUMBAUGH FOR ALICIA PETTIGRE AND MARYSSA PETTIGREW
Date: May 05, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ORDER AND NOTICE OF FINAL SETTLEMENT
Date: November 06, 2013APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DECREE INCORPORATING TERMS OF AGREEMENT
Date: November 13, 2013FINAL DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
Date: May 08, 2014RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - TRACY STUMBAUGH - FOR MARYSSA PETTIGREW
Date: May 05, 2014RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - TALADEGA PETTIGREW S/P/A/ TALADEGA STUMBAUGH
Date: May 05, 2014RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY TRACY STUMBAUGH FOR ALICIA PETTIGREW
Date: May 06, 2014ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND GRANTING FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION
Date: November 13, 2013RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - LYNNSI PETTIGREW
Date: May 05, 2014ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DECREE INCORPORATING TERMS OF AGREEMENT
Date: November 13, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING
Date: November 13, 2013INVENTORY OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
Date: November 13, 2013ORDER APPROVING INTERIM ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS TO ATTORNEY FOR PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
Date: August 08, 2013PUBLICATION SERVICE CHARGE (WITH POUNDAGE) - 60.00
Date: June 11, 2012AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING
Date: November 21, 2012AMENDED LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION
Date: May 29, 2012AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING ON COMMON-LAW MARRIAGE CLAIM
Date: April 17, 2012PUBLICATION SERVICE CHARGE (WITH POUNDAGE) - 45.00
Date: November 01, 2013LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - LYNNSI PETTIGREW
Date: November 19, 2012ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON COMMON-LAW MARRIAGE CLAIM - MAY 15, 2012 @ 1:30 P.M.
Date: April 09, 2012REQUEST TO SET FOR PRETRIAL HEARING - W/ORDER - OCT. . 26, 2012 @ 9:00 AM - W/CERT. OF MAILING
Date: September 14, 2012ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR
Date: March 01, 2012NOTICE TO CREDITORS - PRESENTMENT DATE: MAY 10, 2012 - TDC
Date: March 01, 2012ORDER AND NOTICE OF FINAL SETTLEMENT - TDC
Date: October 15, 2013LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION - LYNNSI PETTIGREW
Date: March 01, 2012COMBINED ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION - JAN. 30, 2012 @ 9:00 AM - TDC
Date: January 10, 2012PUBLICATION SERVICE CHARGE (WITH POUNDAGE) - 61.60
Date: February 02, 2012ALIAS COMBINED ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION - FEBRUARY 13, 2012 - 9:00AM - TDC
Date: January 24, 2012AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING
Date: February 08, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY TRACY STUMBAUGH FOR ALICIA PETTIGREW | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGE JESSE S. HARRIS: FINAL DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ENTERED | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | AUTHORIZATION - TRACY STUMBAUGH FOR ALICIA PETTIGRE AND MARYSSA PETTIGREW | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - TRACY STUMBAUGH - FOR MARYSSA PETTIGREW | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - TALADEGA PETTIGREW S/P/A/ TALADEGA STUMBAUGH | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - LYNNSI PETTIGREW | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DECREE INCORPORATING TERMS OF AGREEMENT | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND GRANTING FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DECREE INCORPORATING TERMS OF AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.