Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tulsa County, OK, . Tulsa County, OK Superior Courts with J. Anthony Miller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTulsa County, OK |
|
RETURN COMMITMENT
Date: January 13, 2022DEFENDANT'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 05, 2022MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Date: July 19, 2022STATE OF OKLAHOMA'S FINAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 05, 2022MOTION TO SUPPRESS ILLEGAL ARREST
Date: August 09, 2022MOTION FOR JACKSON V DENNO HEARING
Date: August 09, 2022STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Date: August 17, 2022MOTION TO SUPPRESS ILLEGAL MISDEMEANOR ARREST
Date: August 15, 2022ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: August 12, 2022COURT REPORTER'S CERTIFICATE
Date: August 19, 2022PAYMENT REQUEST - TRANSCRIPTS
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: August 15, 2022RETURN SUBPOENA
Date: August 17, 2022AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: August 19, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE
Date: August 26, 2022ORDER FOR TRANSCRIPT
Date: August 19, 2022RETURN SUBPOENA
Date: August 26, 2022MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Date: February 11, 2022RETURN RELEASE
Date: February 09, 2022RETURN COMMITMENT
Date: January 26, 2022PAUPER'S AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT FROM 8-19-2022 RETURNED BY PD'S OFFICE | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT REQUEST - TRANSCRIPTS | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | VOUCHER# 510513 PRINTED TO THE BAIL PROJECT, WHICH INCLUDES $ 5,000.00 FROM THIS CASE FOR AC90 - CASH BONDS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF VOUCHER: $ 5,000.00. | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUESTED VOUCHER IN AMOUNT OF 5,000.00 TO THE BAIL PROJECT FROM ACCOUNT AC90. DISBURSEMENT NUMBER 16125155. | |
September 07, 2022 | Hearing | ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT & 2 COPIES OF MOTION HEARING ON AUGUST 19, 2022. ONE COPY EACH TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE. | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT SENT TO D.P.S. | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE ANTHONY MILLER: DEFENDANT PRESENT, NOT IN CUSTODY AND REPRESENTED BY TULSA COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER. STATE REPRESENTED BY JOE COSTA. STATE DISMISSES CASE. COST TO STATE. BOND EXONERATED. | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | THE STATUS OF THE BOND ENTRY DETAILED IN DOCKET SERIAL #118129545 ABOVE HAS CHANGED TO READ AS FOLLOWS: CASH BOND FOR RANDOLPH, MICHAEL DAVID POSTED BY THE BAIL PROJECT, IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,000.00, POSTED 02/08/2022, EXONERATED 08/29/2022 | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.