Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3, filed a(n) Cv case against Matthew T Group, in the jurisdiction of Maricopa County, AZ, . Maricopa County, AZ Superior Courts Maricopa County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMaricopa County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseMaricopa County Superior |
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Date: April 09, 2020COM - Complaint
Date: December 31, 2019NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar
Date: March 24, 2021322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Date: March 11, 2020OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Date: April 15, 2020CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Date: December 31, 2019MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Date: March 05, 2021OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Date: March 10, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.