Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vantage West Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Terry Helland, in the jurisdiction of Maricopa County, AZ, . Maricopa County, AZ Superior Courts Maricopa County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category130 - Contracts |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMaricopa County, AZ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMaricopa County Superior |
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Date: June 03, 2015MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Date: June 02, 2015COM - Complaint
Date: December 31, 2014CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Date: December 31, 2014DFJ - Default Judgment
Date: June 29, 2015AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Date: February 06, 2015023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Date: March 23, 2015AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Date: March 19, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.