Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
National Health Finance D M, L L C, filed a(n) Cv case against Ericco L Di Conti, in the jurisdiction of Maricopa County, AZ, . Maricopa County, AZ Superior Courts Maricopa County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMaricopa County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseMaricopa County Superior |
STP - Stipulation
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Date: December 05, 2016MOT - Motion
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Date: September 27, 2016MOT - Motion
Date: 2015-10-12T00:00:00AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00MOT - Motion
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00COM - Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00NOT - Notice
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Date: July 26, 2016APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Date: October 18, 2016CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00STP - Stipulation
Date: September 28, 2016ORD - Order
Date: June 06, 2016047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00ORD - Order
Date: September 30, 2016RNM - Returned Mail
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: July 01, 2016ORD - Order
Date: 2015-11-06T00:00:00ORD - Order
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Date: December 12, 2016023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00ANS - Answer
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00STP - Stipulation
Date: June 09, 2016322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Date: 2015-04-08T00:00:00MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00ORD - Order
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.