Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Collins Asset Group L L C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Allan Santos, Florence Santos, in the jurisdiction of Maricopa County, AZ, . Maricopa County, AZ Superior Courts Maricopa County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category130 - Contracts |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMaricopa County, AZ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMaricopa County Superior |
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Date: January 12, 2015CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Date: December 31, 2014COM - Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Date: February 09, 2015MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Date: May 22, 2015DFJ - Default Judgment
Date: June 11, 2015SUM - Summons
Date: January 20, 2015SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Date: September 25, 2018PSP - Petition for Supplemental Proceedings
Date: August 11, 2015023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Date: February 13, 2015311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Date: June 03, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.