Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
David F Ruppert, filed a(n) 150-210 - Other case against M D Helicopters Inc, in the jurisdiction of Maricopa County, AZ, . Maricopa County, AZ Superior Courts Maricopa County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category150-210 - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMaricopa County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseMaricopa County Superior |
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Date: April 29, 2015ANS - Answer
Date: January 08, 2015COM - Complaint
Date: December 31, 2014NOF - Notice Of Filing
Date: January 28, 2015022 - ME: Order Signed
Date: January 26, 2015NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials
Date: December 31, 2014SDO - Order to Seal Documents
Date: January 21, 2015042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Date: May 06, 2015339 - ME: 100 Day Notice
Date: April 22, 2015NOT - Notice
Date: April 24, 2015CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.