Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mark Allen Jacques, Melgoza, Roberto, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Cordova, Ricardo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2008 |
CategoryConverted Criminal Fel-Misd-Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.