Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pittsburg County, OK, . Pittsburg County, OK Superior Courts with BLAND, JAMES D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPittsburg County, OK |
|
F&E AGREED ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY AND AMEND CAPTION
Date: January 26, 2016F&E 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL WITNESS LIST OF DEFTS.
Date: January 29, 2016F&E JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES
Date: February 04, 2016F&E RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO
Date: February 01, 2016F&E ORDER EXTENDING SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES S/BLAND
Date: February 08, 2016F&E PL. UNOPPOSED APPL. TO FILE REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT
Date: February 29, 2016F&E CT. MIN. OF 2-3-16. COMES ON FOR PL. MOTION TO
Date: February 05, 2016DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR
Date: June 06, 2016F&E PL. UNOPPOSED APPL. TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
Date: May 23, 2016F&E ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPL. TO FILE REPLY
Date: May 23, 2016F&E DEFTS. RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' APPL. TO SET
Date: May 27, 2016F&E PL. REPLY TO DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC.'S
Date: March 07, 2016F&E DEFT. NARCONON INTERNATIONAL AND ASSOC. FOR BETTER
Date: February 01, 2016F&E 3RD SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL WITNESS LIST OF DEFTS.
Date: February 04, 2016F&E PL. SECOND AMENDED FINAL WITNESS LIST
Date: February 22, 2016F&E 4TH AMENDED FINAL WITNESS LIST OF DEFTS. NARCONON
Date: February 11, 2016F&E ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED APPL. FOR
Date: March 01, 2016F&E 5TH AMENDED FINAL WITNESS LIST OF DEFTS. NARCONON
Date: April 04, 2016F&E PL. REPLY IN RESPONSE TO DEFTS. NARCONON
Date: March 07, 2016MINUTE ORDER 3-16-16: COMES ON FOR: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: March 18, 2016F&E ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (RAYMOND ALLRED FOR PLAINTIFFS)
Date: March 23, 2016F&E ORDER SETTING HEARING (8-17-16 AT 9 AM) S/BLAND
Date: July 07, 2016DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA. INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS'
Date: July 25, 2016F&E APPL. TO MODIFY AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 18, 2016F&E DEFT. NARCONON INTERNATIONAL'S RESPONSE AND
Date: April 29, 2016F&E NOTICE OF FILING (ORIGINAL AND ONE COPY WITH ONE
Date: May 04, 2016F&E RESPONSE TO PL. APPL. TO MODIFY AGREED PROT. ORDER
Date: May 02, 2016F&E PL. APPL. TO SET PRETRIAL CONF.
Date: May 18, 2016F&E ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPL. TO FILE REPLY
Date: May 13, 2016F&E OKLA. DEPT. OF MENTAL HEALTH & SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Date: May 13, 2016F&E PL. UNOPPOSED APPL. TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
Date: May 13, 2016F&E 6TH AMENDED FINAL WITNESS LIST OF DEFTS. NARCONON
Date: May 12, 2016F&E ORDER S/BLAND
Date: June 30, 2016F&E PL. JOINT REPLY TO DEFTS. & ODMHSAS' OBJECTION TO
Date: May 23, 2016F&E MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR
Date: June 29, 2016F&E ORDER SETTING HEARING (8-3-16 AT 9 AM) S/BLAND
Date: July 01, 2016F&E MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR BRIEFS
Date: June 17, 2016MINUTE ORDER 6-22-16: COMES ON FOR PLAINTIFF'S
Date: June 22, 2016F&E ORDER S/BLAND
Date: June 28, 2016F&E CORRECTION TO NARCONON OF OKLA., INC.'S MOTION FOR
Date: July 07, 2016F&E AMENDED APPL. TO MODIFY AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: July 08, 2016F&E AGREED ORDER S/BLAND
Date: July 19, 2016F&E NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS HAD ON
Date: July 21, 2016F&E NARCONON OF OKLA., INC.'S REPLY TO MOTION FOR
Date: August 11, 2016F&E ORDER S/BLAND
Date: August 05, 2016F&E PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFTS.,
Date: August 08, 2016DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO FILE A REPLY
Date: August 04, 2016F&E ORDER SETTING HEARING (1-25-17 AT 9 AM) S/BLAND
Date: January 05, 2017F&E PL. RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NARCONON OF OKLA,
Date: January 05, 2017F&E NARCONON OF OKLA INC'S REQUEST TO FILE A MOTION FOR
Date: December 28, 2016F&E NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT AND REQUEST FOR
Date: December 28, 2016F&E CT. MIN. OF 11-30-16. COMES ON FOR PL. APPL. TO SET
Date: December 07, 2016F&E GERALD D. WOOTAN, D.O., M.ED.'S REPLY TO PL.
Date: August 11, 2016DEFT'S REQUEST TO FILE A REPLY
Date: August 04, 2016F&E PL. APPL. TO SET PRETRIAL CONF.
Date: October 24, 2016F&E REPLY OF NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. TO PLAINTIFFS'
Date: January 19, 2017F&E CT. MIN. OF 1-25-17. COMES ON FOR DEFTS. NOTICE OF
Date: January 31, 2017F&E ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT S/BLAND
Date: August 23, 2016F&E NOTICE OF HEARING (11-30-16 AT 9 AM)
Date: October 31, 2016F&E PL. RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NARCONON OF OKLA.,
Date: January 05, 2017F&E NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS HAD ON
Date: October 04, 2016F&E GERALD D. WOOTAN, D.O., M.ED.'S REPLY TO PL.
Date: August 11, 2016F&E PL. RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT AND
Date: January 06, 2017F&E ORDER SETTING HEARING (2-16-17 AT 3:00 PM S/BLAND
Date: February 02, 2017F&E JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT S/BLAND
Date: February 21, 2017F&E CT. MIN. OF 8-17-16. COMES ON FOR DEFTS. MOTION FOR
Date: August 19, 2016F&E CT. MIN. OF 2-22-17. COMES ON FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF.
Date: February 24, 2017F&E DEFTS. MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE OTHER LITIGATION
Date: March 31, 2017F&E PL. RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NARCONON OF OKLA.,
Date: February 07, 2017F&E DEFTS. REQUEST TO FILE A REPLY
Date: February 09, 2017F&E ORDER S/BLAND
Date: February 15, 2017F&E REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: February 13, 2017F&E ORDER (4-12-17 AT 9 AM) S/BLAND
Date: March 31, 2017F&E ORDER SETTING HEARING (4-19-17 AT 9 AM) S/BLAND
Date: March 09, 2017F&E AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE (DR. GERALD WOOTAN)
Date: April 03, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: May 01, 2017F&E AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE (GARY SMITH)
Date: April 03, 2017F&E AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE (JOEL KERNS)
Date: April 03, 2017F&E AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE (ROGER WADLEY)
Date: April 03, 2017F&E PL. MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 03, 2017F&E AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE (MICHAEL ST. AMAND)
Date: April 03, 2017F&E DEFTS. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: May 01, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA. INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: March 31, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: March 31, 2017F&E NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. D/B/A NARCONON ARROWHEAD'S
Date: March 31, 2017F&E DEFTS. MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF
Date: March 31, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: March 31, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: March 31, 2017F&E DEFTS. OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: March 31, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
Date: April 03, 2017F&E PL. RESPONSE TO DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC.'S
Date: April 10, 2017F&E TRIAL WITNESS LIST OF PLAINTIFFS
Date: May 11, 2017F&E DEFTS. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: May 03, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: April 03, 2017F&E NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 10, 2017F&E PL. DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: April 05, 2017F&E PL. RESPONSE TO DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. D/B/A
Date: April 10, 2017F&E PL. RESPONSE TO DEFTS. MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE
Date: April 10, 2017F&E PL. RESPONSE TO DEFTS. OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: April 10, 2017F&E PL. RESPONSE TO DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. D/B/A
Date: April 10, 2017F&E PL. COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: April 19, 2017F&E NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 27, 2017F&E PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFTS. TRIAL EXHIBITS
Date: April 26, 2017NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR
Date: April 11, 2017F&E DEFTS. REQUEST TO FILE A REPLY
Date: April 12, 2017F&E DEFTS. RESPONSE TO PL. MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 10, 2017F&E PL. AMENDED DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: April 13, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: April 17, 2017F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: April 17, 2017F&E PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: April 26, 2017F&E NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL ONLY PROCEEDINGS HAD ON
Date: April 18, 2017F&E CT. MIN. OF 4-19-17. COMES ON FOR DEFTS. MOTION TO
Date: April 24, 2017F&E DEFTS. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: May 01, 2017F&E DEFTS. PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: April 28, 2017PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT NARCONON
Date: April 17, 2017F&E ORDER S/BLAND
Date: April 12, 2017F&E REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFT. NARCONON OF
Date: April 17, 2017F&E PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFTS. DESIGNATIONS OF
Date: April 26, 2017F&E REQUEST FOR COMMISSION TO TAKE FOREIGN DEPOSITION
Date: May 02, 2017F&E DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: May 22, 2017F&E PL. PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: April 28, 2017F&E DEFTS. NARCONON OF OKLA. INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: May 01, 2017F&E PL. RESPONSE TO DEFTS. MOTION TO PROHIBIT EXTRA
Date: May 03, 2017F&E DEFTS. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON
Date: May 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | F&E DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | F&E TRIAL WITNESS LIST OF PLAINTIFFS | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | F&E NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | F&E ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS HAD ON 5-1-17 | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | F&E DEFTS. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
F&E PL. RESPONSE TO DEFTS. MOTION TO PROHIBIT EXTRA JUDICIAL/PUBLIC COMMENTS ARROWHEAD OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF BRITTANY GAUNCE HAD ON 5-1-17 |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | F&E REQUEST FOR COMMISSION TO TAKE FOREIGN DEPOSITION | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | F&E DEFT. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
F&E DEFTS. NARCONON OF OKLAHOMA, INC. D/B/A NARCONON ARROWHEAD'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTERDESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF KIMBERLY POFF ARROWHEAD'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTERDESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF SHIRLEY FRAZEE |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
F&E DEFTS. NARCONON OF OKLA., INC. D/B/A NARCONON ARROWHEAD OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF BROOKE KELLY ARROWHEAD OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF COREY MCDANIELS ARROWHEAD OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION OF BRYAN STILL ARROWHEAD COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION OF BRYAN STILL ARROWHEAD OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF BRITTNEY HERRMANN ARROWHEAD OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF DAVID SHAHHOSSEINI ARROWHEAD AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF DAVID SHAHHOSSEINI ARROWHEAD OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF DARREN M. LEHRFELD ARROWHEAD'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTERDESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF WILLIAM KENT MCGREGOR ARROWHEAD'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTERDESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF KELLI LYNN ANDERSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.