Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marshall County, OK, . Marshall County, OK Superior Courts with Gregory L. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMarshall County, OK |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | WARRANT RETURNED RECALLED | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
WARRANT RECALL NOTICE SENT TO MCSO TALKED TO CANDY (Entry with fee only) |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT & SENTENCE | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT ISSUED MCSO - $110 CASH ONLY | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | SUSPENSION NOTICE MAILED TO DEFENDANT | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE AND ENTER CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.