Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marshall County, OK, . Marshall County, OK Superior Courts marshall County with JOHNSON, GREGORY L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarshall County, OK |
|
Filing Court Housemarshall County |
SUMMARY ORDER-IA: NOT GUILTY PLEA ENTERED CASE SET FOR
Date: March 28, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND
Date: March 31, 2023CERTIFICATE OF EMAILING
Date: April 03, 2023SUMMARY ORDER-INITIAL APPEARANCE/NOT GUILTY PLEA
Date: March 08, 2023CM: (XX) PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFERENCE RESET TO
Date: March 13, 2023ORDER APPOINTING/OIDS/JAMES GILMARTIN
Date: March 13, 2023APPLICATION FOR COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL
Date: March 13, 2023EMAIL OF MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: May 18, 2023ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 18, 2023WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING
Date: June 14, 2023MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: May 22, 2023SUMMARY ORDER-PHC: PRELIMINARY HEARING WAIVED AND
Date: June 14, 2023ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 09, 2023CM: BY AGREEMENT OF PARTIES CASE IS RESET TO AUGUST
Date: August 02, 2023MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM: BY AGREEMENT OF PARTIES CASE IS RESET TO AUGUST 9, 2023 AT 9:00 A.M. |
|
June 14, 2023 | Hearing | WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING | |
June 14, 2023 | Hearing |
SUMMARY ORDER-PHC: PRELIMINARY HEARING WAIVED AND FORMAL ARRAIGNMENT IN FRONT OF JUDGE COPPEDGE SET FOR 8/2/23 @ 9:00 A.M. |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | EMAIL OF MOTION TO CONTINUE | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF EMAILING | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.