Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Mcintosh County, OK, . Mcintosh County, OK Superior Courts with Brendon Bridges presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 24, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMcintosh County, OK |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIG. WARRANT RECALL NOTICE RET'D | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIG BW RET'D AS RECALLED | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | WARRANT RECALL NOTICE ISSUED TO SHERIFF | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAW TO DPS | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFD. CALLED TO MAKE PYMT CARD WAS DENIED TWICE | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFD. CALLED STATED SHE FORGOT ABOUT CITATION & WILL | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
TRAFFIC B.W. ISS FAILURE TO APPEAR OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND NOT BE ABLE TO PAY TILL 10/15/19.SHE WAS GOING TO CALL & & SPEAK W/DA DUE TO SHE WORKS W/DHS.LV W/BAILEE & ONCE W/ME DEFD. IS GOING TO CALL BACK TODAY EXPLAINED IF CARD WAS DENIED AGAIN SHE COULD HAVE TO COME IN OR MAIL PYMT IN.LV (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | BB3 ORDER OF SUSPENSION MAILED TO DPS | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILING FEE FINE DA COUNCIL FEE OCIS REVOLVING FUND SHERIFF-COURTHOUSE SECURITY ATTORNEY GENERAL LAW ENFORCEMENT REVOLVING FUND CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT SHERIFF'S SERVICE AND INCARCERATION FEE ACCOUNT CLEET PENALTY ASSESSMENT CLEET ASSESSMENT FOR AFIS FORENSIC SCIENCE IMPROVEMENT ASSESSMENT FUND DPS PATROL VEHICLE REVOLVING FUND COURT CLERK'S REVOLVING FUND DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.