Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Mcintosh County, OK, . Mcintosh County, OK Superior Courts mcintosh County with BRIDGES, BRENDON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMcintosh County, OK |
|
Filing Court Housemcintosh County |
SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION
Date: August 12, 2020CM:(BRIDGES)IA: STATE APP. BY DAVID PIERCE,A.D.A. DEFD.
Date: September 14, 2020SUBPOENA (1) ISS TO SHF. (CRIMINAL ONLY)
Date: October 29, 2020ORIGINAL SUBPOENA RET'D SERVING LUCAS MCEWEN
Date: October 29, 2020CM:(BRIDGES)PPC: STATE APPD. BY DAVID PIERCE, A.D.A.
Date: October 07, 2020BOND CONDITIONS
Date: September 14, 2020SUBPOENA ISS. TO D.A.
Date: November 18, 2020APPL FOR APPT COUNSEL IDF1/FEE DEFERRED
Date: September 23, 2020SUBPOENA (1) ISS TO SHF. (CRIMINAL ONLY)
Date: November 18, 2020ORIG BW RET'D AS SERVED
Date: December 22, 2021FILE & ENTER INFORMATION
Date: August 12, 2020CM:(BRIDGES)STATUS/REVIEW: DEFD APPD BY VIDEO. DEFD'S
Date: January 19, 2022COURT ORDER RELATING TO THE APPEARANCE WITH COUNSEL
Date: September 14, 2020MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: January 19, 2022CM:(BRIDGES)FTA: DEFD APPD BY VIDEO. PREVIOUS BOND
Date: December 21, 2021INDIGENCY APPOINTMENT (RYAN FERGUSON)
Date: October 28, 2020MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION
Date: January 13, 2021SUBPOENA ISS. TO D.A.
Date: October 29, 2020ORIGINAL SUBPOENA RET'D SERVING TYLER LEWIS
Date: November 18, 2020CM:(BRIDGES)MCGIRT: DEFD APPD NOT(PITTSBURG COUNTY)
Date: March 03, 2021STATEMENT OF JAIL TIME (# OF DAYS X 36.00)=TOTAL $
Date: January 19, 2021PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND
Date: January 13, 2021ORIGINAL SUBPOENA RET'D SERVING TYLER LEWIS, EUFAULA PD
Date: October 29, 2020BOND CONDITIONS
Date: November 18, 2020ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE(2-16-22 @ 9AM)
Date: January 19, 2022CM:(BRIDGES) PRELIM: DEFD. APPD IN CUSTODY W/ ATTY
Date: November 18, 2020CERTIFICATION TO COURT CLERK
Date: December 17, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF
Date: January 19, 2022CM:(BRIDGES)PPC: STATE APPD. BY DAVID PIERCE, A.D.A.
Date: October 28, 2020CM:(BRIDGES)MCGIRT: DEFD APPD IN CUSTODY W/ATTY
Date: January 05, 2022ORIG SUBPOENA RET'D SERVING EMILY MULLINKIS (10-31-20)
Date: November 03, 2020B.W. ISS TO MCI CO SHERIFF (FAILURE TO APPEAR)
Date: March 04, 2021STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR
Date: January 14, 2021CM:(BRIDGES) PER ANNOUNCEMENT CONT DUE TO WEATHER CONT.
Date: February 17, 2021CM:(BRIDGES)PRELIM: ST. APPD BY DAVID PIERCE, A.D.A.
Date: January 13, 2021ORIG SUBPOENA RET'D SERVING EMILY MULLINIKS ON 11-24-20
Date: December 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | (Entry with fee only) | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSING COSTS | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM:(BRIDGES)STATUS/REVIEW: DEFD APPD BY VIDEO. DEFD'S 20 DAY STAY WILL EXPIRE ON 01-25-22. DEFD TO BE RELEASED ON THIS DATE IS NO FEDERAL CHARGES HAVE BEEN FILED. JURISDICTOIN |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE(2-16-22 @ 9AM) | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM:(BRIDGES)MCGIRT: DEFD APPD IN CUSTODY W/ATTY R.FERUGSON. DFD EXHIBIT #1 ADMITTED W/O OBJ. PARTIES STIPULATE THE DEFD IS AN INDIAN UNDER FEDERAL LAW AND THE ALLEGED CRIME OCCURED ON INDIAN LAND. THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED W/COST TO STATE. COURT ENTERS A (20) DAY STAY. REVIEW SET 1-19-22 @ 9 A.M. |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIG BW RET'D AS SERVED | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIG WARRANT RET'D AS SERVED | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CM:(BRIDGES)FTA: DEFD APPD BY VIDEO. PREVIOUS BOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.