Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Mccurtain County, OK, . Mccurtain County, OK Superior Courts with Gary L. Brock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Brock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMccurtain County, OK |
|
CERTIFICATE OF NON-SERVICE (J.L.R.)
Date: February 25, 2022ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER
Date: January 11, 2022CERTIFICATE OF NON-SERVICE (C.R.)
Date: February 25, 2022GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS/ISSUE
Date: June 29, 2022DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BOTH)
Date: April 25, 2022ALIAS AFFIDAVIT (BOTH)
Date: February 28, 2022TO FILE RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: April 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS/ISSUE OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07 SUMMONS OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND STATE JUDICIAL INTERPRETER TRANSLATOR (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS/ISSUE OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07 SUMMONS OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND STATE JUDICIAL INTERPRETER TRANSLATOR (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BOTH) | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | TO FILE RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ALIAS AFFIDAVIT (BOTH) | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-SERVICE (J.L.R.) | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-SERVICE (C.R.) | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.