Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Mccurtain County, OK, . Mccurtain County, OK Superior Courts with Michael D. DeBerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael D. DeBerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMccurtain County, OK |
|
JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2022CIVIL PETITION UNDER $10000
Date: February 24, 2021FIRST AMENDED PETITON
Date: March 10, 2021SUMMONS AND RETURN - SERVED
Date: March 24, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AND RETURN - SERVED | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE SUMMONS - C. ADAMS | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED PETITON | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL PETITION UNDER $10000 (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND STATE JUDICIAL FUND INTERPRETER FUND 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.