Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Logan County, OK, . Logan County, OK Superior Courts with Louis A. Duel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLogan County, OK |
|
WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING AND BIND- OVER ORDER
Date: February 25, 2021ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2023-298879 ON 08/11/2023. PAYOR: BUSSARD, JAMES TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 40.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2020-27: $40.00 ON AC14 FINES FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2023-297738 ON 07/05/2023. PAYOR: BUSSARD, JAMES TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2020-27: $3.25 ON AC14 FINES FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. CF-2020-27: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. CF-2020-27: $19.65 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. CF-2020-27: $21.10 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2023-296964 ON 06/06/2023. PAYOR: BUSSARD, JAMES TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2020-27: $50.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2023-296280 ON 05/08/2023. PAYOR: BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2020-27: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. CF-2020-27: $13.10 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. CF-2020-27: $3.90 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2023-295171 ON 04/03/2023. 50.00 CHANGE PAYOR: BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2020-27: $50.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2023-294372 ON 03/06/2023. PAYOR: BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2020-27: $50.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR BUSSARD, JAMES RICHARD. | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DISTRICT ATTORNEY PROSECUTION REIMBURSEMENT NOTICE AND PAYMENT PLAN | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COST ADMINISTRATION PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT SET AT $50.00, ONCE A MONTH, BEGINNING 3/7/2023 - PP-LO-2023-49 | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FELONY APPLICATION FOR DEFERRED OR SUSPENDED SENTENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.