Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Le Flore County, OK, . Le Flore County, OK Superior Courts with Jeffrey R. Singer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 23, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLe Flore County, OK |
|
FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER
Date: August 17, 2015ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE)
Date: August 05, 2015FILE RETURN GREEN CARD
Date: August 10, 2015FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE RETURN GREEN CARD | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE JOURNAL ENTRY | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE RETURN OF SERVICE | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.