Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Le Flore County, OK, . Le Flore County, OK Superior Courts with Jeffrey R. Singer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLe Flore County, OK |
|
FILE RETURN SUMMONS
Date: October 13, 2015FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2015FILE SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 28, 2015FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 23, 2015FILE RETURN GREEN CARD
Date: December 10, 2015FILE RELEASE
Date: January 08, 2016FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2015ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE)
Date: December 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | FILE RELEASE | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE RETURN GREEN CARD | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE RETURN SUMMONS | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE SUMMONS | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE AND ENTER PETITION (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.