Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Custer County, OK, . Custer County, OK Superior Courts with Stephanie C. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCuster County, OK |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CM: RULE 8 PAYMENT ORDER FILED AND SCANNED | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RULE 8 SENT TO JUDGE'S OFFICE FOR SIGNATURE. KG | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION ON FINES/COSTS FILED AND SCANNED CAUSE COMES ON FOR RULE 8 HEARING. BY AGREEMENT BETWEEN DEFT AND THE COST ADMINISTRATOR, DEFT WILL BE ALLOWED TO PAY THE BALANCE OWING AT THE RATE OF $100 PER MONTH THE FIRST PAYMENT BEGINNING 8-5-23 AND CONTINUING MONTHLY THEREAFTER UNTIL PAID IN FULL OR UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. REVIEW HEARING IS SET FOR 11-2-23 AT 1:00 P.M. (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION ON FINES/COSTS FILED AND SCANNED CAUSE COMES ON FOR RULE 8 HEARING. BY AGREEMENT BETWEEN DEFT AND THE COST ADMINISTRATOR, DEFT WILL BE ALLOWED TO PAY THE BALANCE OWING AT THE RATE OF $100 PER MONTH THE FIRST PAYMENT BEGINNING 8-5-23 AND CONTINUING MONTHLY THEREAFTER UNTIL PAID IN FULL OR UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. REVIEW HEARING IS SET FOR 11-2-23 AT 1:00 P.M. (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION LAW LIBRARY FEE SHERIFF ARREST FEE ASSESSMENT - DPS FINE CLEET AFIS STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE 10% OF AFS1 10% OF CL10 10% OF FO10 10% OF DPS DISTRICT ATTORNEY REVOLVING FUND 10% OF DARF TRAUMA CARE REVOLVING FUND 10% TCRF OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT 10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL CCRF FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION LAW LIBRARY FEE SHERIFF ARREST FEE FINE ASSESSMENT - DPS CLEET AFIS STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE 10% OF AFS1 10% OF CL10 10% OF FO10 10% OF DPS DISTRICT ATTORNEY REVOLVING FUND 10% OF DARF TRAUMA CARE REVOLVING FUND ASSESSMENT 10% TCRF OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT 10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND ADDITIONAL CCRF FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.