Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Custer County, OK, . Custer County, OK Superior Courts with Stephanie C. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCuster County, OK |
|
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE ;FILE AND SCAN
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF
Date: January 06, 2022ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN
Date: January 24, 2022CM: SCJ
Date: February 02, 2022NON JURY JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN
Date: February 16, 2022ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF
Date: January 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NON JURY JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CM: SCJ | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN DEF SERVED ON 01/19/2022 BY OKLAHOMA CO SO 50.00 PARTIES APPEAR PRO SE. AFTER RECEIVING SWORN TESTIMONY AND RECEIVING EVIDENCE, THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO FEBRUARY 16, 2022 AT 9:30 A.M. TO DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF DAMAGES. 4000.00 PLAINTFF 108.00 COST |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN DEF SERVED ON 01/19/2022 BY OKLAHOMA CO SO 50.00 PARTIES APPEAR PRO SE. AFTER RECEIVING SWORN TESTIMONY AND RECEIVING EVIDENCE, THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO FEBRUARY 16, 2022 AT 9:30 A.M. TO DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF DAMAGES. 4000.00 PLAINTFF 108.00 COST |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE ;FILE AND SCAN | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF LAW LIBRARY FEE DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE SHERIFF FEE (OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF) |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF LAW LIBRARY FEE DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE SHERIFF FEE (OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.