Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Custer County, OK, . Custer County, OK Superior Courts with Donna L. Dirickson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCuster County, OK |
|
AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF
Date: October 23, 2017NON JURY JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN
Date: November 15, 2017ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED ;FILE AND SCAN
Date: October 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN
Date: October 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NON JURY JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED ;FILE AND SCAN DEF SERVED ON 10/28/2017 BY DILLON MACH CUSTER CO SO 50.00 1913.80 PLAINITFF 213.00 C OST DEFENDANT TO PAY 200.00 MONTHLY BEGINNING 12/01/2017 AND ON EACH MONTH THEREAFTER UNTIL JUDGMENT IS PAID IN FULL |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF LAW LIBRARY FEE DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE SHERIFF FEE |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.