Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Custer County, OK, . Custer County, OK Superior Courts with Jill Carpenter Weedon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCuster County, OK |
|
AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED
Date: October 19, 2020APPRAISEMENT OF REAL ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION FIL &
Date: September 01, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED
Date: January 10, 2020JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED
Date: March 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED
Date: September 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED
Date: September 14, 2020AMENDED AND CORRECTED ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT FIL &
Date: October 22, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED - FIL & SCANNED
Date: November 25, 2019SHERIFF'S RETURN FIL & SCANNED
Date: September 01, 2020FILE & ENTER PETITION
Date: October 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED
Date: December 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED
Date: March 10, 2020CM: JCW/DM
Date: February 07, 2020SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE ISSUED TO CCSO
Date: June 12, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE FIL & SCANNED
Date: September 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE FIL &
Date: August 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED
Date: August 17, 2020SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE RETURNED - FIL &
Date: September 01, 2020NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED
Date: December 04, 2019AMENDED AND CORRECTED MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE FIL &
Date: October 05, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY TO SERVE: SPOUSE OF G.
Date: October 22, 2019NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE FIL & SCANNED
Date: September 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FIL & SCANNED
Date: March 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FIL & SCANNED
Date: February 24, 2020BILL OF APPRAISERS FIL & SCANNED
Date: September 01, 2020ALIAS NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED
Date: December 12, 2019MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE FIL & SCANNED
Date: September 01, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED
Date: November 05, 2020FIRST AMENDED PETITION FIL & SCANNED
Date: December 04, 2019ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT FIL & SCANNED
Date: October 05, 2020ORDER CONFIRMING SALE FIL & SCANNED
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED AND CORRECTED ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT FIL & SCANNED |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | POUNDAGE (1% OF THE AMOUNT, NOT TO EXCEED $300) | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED AND CORRECTED MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE FIL & SCANNED |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT FIL & SCANNED | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER CONFIRMING SALE FIL & SCANNED | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
APPRAISEMENT OF REAL ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION FIL & SCANNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.