Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Craig County, OK, . Craig County, OK Superior Courts with Gary L. Maxey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 15, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCraig County, OK |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
CM: RESPONDENT IS IN COMPLIANCE AND HAS PURGED THE CONTEMPT CITATION. |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURN OF CITATION FOR CONTEMPT FILED SHF CRAIG | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR CONTEMPT CITATION OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | CITATION FOR CONTEMP CITATION ISSUED SHF CRAIG | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DISSOLUTION | |
February 24, 2009 | Hearing | ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.