Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Comanche County, OK, . Comanche County, OK Superior Courts with Kenny D. Harris presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationComanche County, OK |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE // JENNY M OLSON // NOT FOUND | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT HD81002 | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2019-662073 ON 01/17/2019. PAYOR: HOOD & STACY, P.A. TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 229.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2019-24: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2019-24: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2019-24: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2019-24: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2019-24: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2019-24: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2019-24: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2019-24: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2019-24: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2019-24: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2019-24: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFF’S SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE HARRIS, KENNY D. TO THIS CASE. | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE) JENNY M OLSON | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.