Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Comanche County, OK, . Comanche County, OK Superior Courts with Kenny D. Harris presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenny D. Harris Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationComanche County, OK |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | UPDATE OF CASE INFORMATION, SENT TO COLLECTION AGENCY. BATCH ID: 20161117-935 - COLLECTION ID: 2648 | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | WARRANT RETURNED 11/17/2016, WARRANT ISSUED ON 4/21/2016 | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2016-582944 ON 11/16/2016. PAYOR: ABIGAIL M IMES TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 739.05. LINE ITEMS: CM-2014-135: $43.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $3.00 ON AC07 ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $95.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $9.00 ON AC11 CLEET PENALTY ASSESSMENT FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $30.00 ON AC12 VICTIM'S COMPENSATION ASSESSMENT (VCA) FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $150.00 ON AC14 FINES FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $5.00 ON AC21 AFIS FUND FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $5.00 ON AC22 SHERIFF'S SERVICE & INCARCERATION FEE FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $19.50 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $50.00 ON AC35 INMATE JAIL COSTS/INCARCERATION FEE-PRIVATE FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $3.00 ON AC69 CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY FEE FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $5.00 ON AC75 FORENSIC SCIENCE IMPROVEMENT ASSESSMENTS FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $10.00 ON AC76 MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $15.00 ON AC77 DA COUNCIL PROSECUTION ASSESSMENT FEE FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $10.00 ON AC78 OKLAHOMA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH/TRAUMA CARE FUND FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $75.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $25.00 ON AC80 JAIL FUND (BOND FEE) SHERIFF OR PRIVATE JAIL FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $170.55 ON AC87 WARRANTS COLLECTIONS FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. CM-2014-135: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFF’S SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY FOR IMES, ABIGAIL M. | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT RECALLED, WARRANT ISSUED ON 4/21/2016 | |
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event | CLAIM FOR INTERCEPT OF TAX REFUND | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | ADDITION OF 10% FOR WARRANT COLLECTION | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE SENT FOR COLLECTION. BATCH ID: 20160518-816 - COLLECTION ID: 2648 | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | REDUCTION IN BENCH WARRANT FEE TO SHERIFF (10%) | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTE / JUDGE HARRIS DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR AND OR PAY FINES AND COURT COST AS ORDERED PURSUANT TO RULE 8 BENCH WARRANT TO BE ISSUED BOND SET AT $568.50 | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT ISSUED - RULE 8, JUDGE: KENNY HARRIS - BOND AMOUNT: $568.50 COUNT 1 - OBTAINING WELFARE ASSISTANCE BY FRAUD WARRANT RECALLED 11/16/2016, WARRANT ISSUED ON 4/21/2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.