Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Cleveland County, OK, . Cleveland County, OK Superior Courts with Tracy Schumacher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCleveland County, OK |
|
DEFENDANT MARY JO RAINS' PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: June 08, 2016PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT
Date: October 06, 2015ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - BARBARA K BURATTI ATTY FOR DEF
Date: March 28, 2014SCHEDULING ORDER / ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (TS) PTC SET 1-13-14 @ 10:15AM
Date: August 13, 2013NOTICE OF DOCUMENT SUBPOENA
Date: January 06, 2014ANSWER / DEF MARY JO RAINS
Date: January 24, 2013CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: February 21, 2013TRIAL SUBPOENA SERVED/PPS/AUDREY DONOVAN WAS SERVED ON 5-20-2016
Date: May 23, 2016TRIAL SUBPOENA TO AUDREY DONOVAN/ 6-13-2016 @ 9:00AM
Date: May 19, 2016PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT
Date: June 07, 2016PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER / TB / IN RE: JUNE 13. 2016 10:00 A.M.
Date: June 08, 2016MOTIONS IN LIMINE OF DEFENDANT MARY JO RAINS
Date: September 15, 2015PLAINTIFF'S THIRD NOTICE OF VIDEO TRIAL DEPOSITION
Date: May 19, 2016DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: October 12, 2016PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S TRIAL EXHIBITS
Date: June 07, 2016JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: March 24, 2015PLT'FS NOTICE OF VIDEO TRIAL DEPOSITION
Date: October 21, 2015JOINT APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE AND JANUARY TRIAL DATE
Date: December 17, 2014PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: January 11, 2016NOTICE OF AMENDED SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE AND PERMIT INSPECTION AND COPYING OF DOCUMENTS
Date: February 11, 2014LIMITED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL RECORDS - TS
Date: February 25, 2014JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: February 05, 2014NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - JOHN J SMITH
Date: February 06, 2014NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: February 03, 2014ORDER ***TS*** RE: PTC CONT TO 4-14-14 AT 10:30AM BEFORE JUDGE SCHUMACHER
Date: February 05, 2014ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / TIM D. CAIN, ATTY FOR DEF
Date: January 31, 2014ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / MARY JO RAINS BY ATTORNEY STEPHANIE L. KHOURY
Date: January 02, 2014ORDER (TS) RE: MTN TO EXTEND DEADLINES GRANTED & PTC SET 3-3-14 @ 9:45AM
Date: January 09, 2014ORDER (TS) RE: MTN FOR SUBSTITUTION IS GRANTED
Date: January 08, 2014NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE AND PERMIT INSPECTION AND COPYING OF DOCUMENTS
Date: January 13, 2014ORDER (TS) RE: MTN FOR SUBSTITUTION IS GRANTED
Date: January 09, 2014JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: January 06, 2014DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL / MARY JO RAINS--DEFENDANT BY STEPHANIE L. KHOURY
Date: January 02, 2014LIMITED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL RECORDS ***TS***
Date: May 02, 2013PETITION
Date: January 08, 2013ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / MARY JO RAINS BY ATTORNEY MICHAEL WOODSON
Date: January 02, 2014ORDER ***TS*** RE: PTC RESET TO 8-19-14 AT 9:15AM BEFORE JUDGE SCHUMACHER
Date: April 16, 2014ORDER OF CONTINUANCE (TS) / PTC SET 6-30-15 AT 9:30AM
Date: March 24, 2015TRIAL SUBPOENA TO AUDREY DONOVAN / 1-25-2016 9:00 A.M.
Date: December 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | SO: (6-10-2016) JURY TRIAL SET 6-13-2016 CONT BY AGREEMENT TO 8-22-2016. PARTIES TO SCHEDULE PTC BY AGREEMENT AS NECESSARY BEFORE JUDGE BALKMAN (TB) | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S NEWLY-DISCLOSED WITNESS BASED ON GROUNDS OF UNFAIR SURPRISE AND MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO RESPOND | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MARY JO RAINS' PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER / TB / IN RE: JUNE 13. 2016 10:00 A.M. | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S TRIAL EXHIBITS | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMARY ORDER: 5-24-2016 MR. BERRY AND MR. CAIN APPEAR THEY ADVISE OF AGREED SCHEDULED TRIAL DEPOS. REQUEST JUNE TERM, REALLY FOR TRIAL. CASE SET JUNE 13, 2016 TERM--? DOCKET. TS | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | TRIAL SUBPOENA SERVED/PPS/AUDREY DONOVAN WAS SERVED ON 5-20-2016 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | TRIAL SUBPOENA TO AUDREY DONOVAN/ 6-13-2016 @ 9:00AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.