We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cv202100073

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cv202100073

Filing Date

June 16, 2021

Last Refreshed

March 21, 2022

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Case Documents for Cv202100073

MISCELLANEOUS: Miscellaneous

Date: November 04, 2021

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: June 16, 2021

ANSWER: ANSWER

Date: July 23, 2021

ANSWER: ANSWER

Date: July 29, 2021

MOTION: Motion

Date: October 10, 2021

ORDER: Denying

Date: December 20, 2021

COMPLAINT: Complaint

Date: June 16, 2021

Case Events for Cv202100073

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER: Denying
Docket Event MISCELLANEOUS: Miscellaneous
Docket Event SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Docket Event MOTION: Motion
Docket Event SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Docket Event ANSWER: ANSWER
Docket Event MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Docket Event ANSWER: ANSWER
Docket Event SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Docket Event COMPLAINT: Complaint
See all events