We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cv201800149

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cv201800149

Filing Date

July 16, 2018

Last Refreshed

March 24, 2022

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Case Documents for Cv201800149

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: December 06, 2018

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: August 31, 2018

JUDGMENT: Judgment

Date: September 10, 2018

SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00

ORDER: Order

Date: August 09, 2018

MOTION: Continue

Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00

WRIT: OF RESTITUTION

Date: September 19, 2018

MOTION: Continue

Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00

COMPLAINT: Complaint

Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00

JUDGMENT: Judgment

Date: September 05, 2018

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: September 04, 2018

MISCELLANEOUS: Praecipe

Date: September 17, 2018

MOTION: Appear Telephonically

Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT

Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00

CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail

Date: September 11, 2018

ORDER: Order

Date: August 10, 2018

ORDER: Order

Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00

Case Events for Cv201800149

Type Description
Docket Event SERVICE: Certificate
Docket Event WRIT: OF RESTITUTION
Docket Event MISCELLANEOUS: Praecipe
Docket Event CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail
Docket Event JUDGMENT: Judgment
Docket Event JUDGMENT: Judgment
Docket Event SERVICE: Certificate
Docket Event SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Docket Event ORDER: Order
Docket Event ORDER: Order
See all events