We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System Vs Gregory Brockway Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System, filed a(n) Cv case against Gregory E Brockway, in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts Apache County Superior with JUDGE PRO TEM STEVE WILLIAMS presiding.

Case Details for Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System v. Gregory E Brockway

Judge

JUDGE PRO TEM STEVE WILLIAMS

Filing Date

October 30, 2017

Category

Cv

Last Refreshed

January 29, 2022

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Filing Court House

Apache County Superior

Parties for Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System v. Gregory E Brockway

Plaintiffs

Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Gregory E Brockway

Other Parties

Gary F Urman (Attorney)

Pro Per (Attorney)

Case Documents for Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System v. Gregory E Brockway

WRIT: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION

Date: September 14, 2021

MISCELLANEOUS: Miscellaneous

Date: August 18, 2021

APPLICATION: APPLICATION

Date: March 30, 2020

WRIT: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION

Date: December 06, 2019

AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT

Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00

MOTION: Extend Time for Service

Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00

MOTION: Motion

Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00

ORDER: Extending Time for Service

Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00

COMPLAINT: Complaint

Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00

SERVICE: ACCEPTANCE

Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00

APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00

JUDGMENT: Default

Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00

ORDER: SETTING

Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00

APPLICATION: APPLICATION

Date: May 05, 2021

WRIT: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION

Date: March 30, 2020

AFFIDAVIT: IN SUPPORT OF

Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00

APPLICATION: APPLICATION

Date: November 13, 2019

Case Events for Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System v. Gregory E Brockway

Type Description
Docket Event WRIT: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION
Docket Event MISCELLANEOUS: Miscellaneous
Docket Event WRIT: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION
Docket Event APPLICATION: APPLICATION
Docket Event APPLICATION: APPLICATION
Docket Event WRIT: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION
Docket Event WRIT: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION
Docket Event APPLICATION: APPLICATION
Docket Event WRIT: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION
Docket Event MinuteEntry event for Minute Entry: Default Judgment
See all events