We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cv201400190

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cv201400190

Filing Date

October 17, 2014

Last Refreshed

March 18, 2022

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Case Documents for Cv201400190

REQUEST: Request

Date: June 03, 2015

NOTICE: SETTLEMENT

Date: January 07, 2016

ANSWER: ANSWER

Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00

ACCEPTANCE: ACCEPTANCE

Date: December 28, 2015

ORDER: SETTING

Date: June 04, 2015

ORDER: Reassignment of Judge

Date: December 29, 2015

ORDER: Order

Date: April 24, 2015

COMPLAINT: Complaint

Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00

DEMAND: Demand for Jury Trial

Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00

SERVICE: Proof of Notice

Date: November 27, 2015

ORDER: Order

Date: June 29, 2015

SERVICE: Proof of Notice

Date: 2015-02-12T00:00:00

DEMAND: Demand for Jury Trial

Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00

Case Events for Cv201400190

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER: DISMISSING CASE W/ PREJUDICE
Docket Event STIPULATION: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Docket Event NOTICE: SETTLEMENT
Docket Event ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Docket Event ACCEPTANCE: ACCEPTANCE
Docket Event SERVICE: Proof of Notice
Docket Event ORDER: Order
Docket Event ORDER: SETTING
Docket Event REQUEST: Request
Docket Event ORDER: Order
See all events