Contents

Details Case Events

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Oklahoma V. Damon R Sanders Pif

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Adair County, OK, . Adair County, OK Superior Courts adair County with Unassigned presiding.

Case Details for State Of Oklahoma V. Damon R Sanders Pif

Judge

Unassigned

Filing Date

September 04, 2013

Last Refreshed

September 07, 2022

Filing Location

Adair County, OK

Filing Court House

adair County

Case Events for State Of Oklahoma V. Damon R Sanders Pif

Type Description
Docket Event VERIFICATION OF INCARCERATION FEES
Docket Event UPDATE OF CASE INFORMATION, SENT TO COLLECTION AGENCY. BATCH ID: 20141217-1152 - COLLECTION ID: 2083
Docket Event FAILURE TO PAY/ FAILURE TO APPEAR - MINUTE - ORDER
Docket Event RECEIPT # 2014-85783 ON 12/16/2014. PAYOR:BRENDA SANDERS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $437.45. LINE ITEMS: TR-2013-473: $88.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $3.00 ON AC07 ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $45.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $9.00 ON AC11 CLEET PENALTY ASSESSMENT FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $50.00 ON AC14 FINES FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $5.00 ON AC21 AFIS FUND FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $5.00 ON AC22 SHERIFF'S SERVICE & INCARCERATION FEE FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $17.50 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $3.00 ON AC69 CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY FEE FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $20.00 ON AC71 DPS PATROL VEHICLE REVOLVING FUND FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $5.00 ON AC75 FORENSIC SCIENCE IMPROVEMENT ASSESSMENTS FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $10.00 ON AC77 DA COUNCIL PROSECUTION ASSESSMENT FEE FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $10.00 ON AC78 OKLAHOMA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH/TRAUMA CARE FUND FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $50.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $100.95 ON AC87 WARRANTS COLLECTIONS FOR SANDERS, DAMON R. TR-2013-473: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFF’S SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY FOR SANDERS, DAMON R.
Docket Event WARRANT RETURNED 12/15/2014, WARRANT ISSUED ON 10/3/2014, WARRANT SERVED ON 12/12/2014
Docket Event CASE SENT FOR COLLECTION. BATCH ID: 20141006-1096 - COLLECTION ID: 2083
Docket Event REDUCTION IN BENCH WARRANT FEE TO SHERIFF (10%)
Docket Event ADDITION OF 10% FOR WARRANT COLLECTION
Docket Event CLERK'S BENCH WARRANT FEE {TITLE 22 O.S.966A}
Docket Event OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND
See all events