Contents

Details Case Events

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Oklahoma V. Ramsey Ray Harjo - Pif

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Adair County, OK, . Adair County, OK Superior Courts adair County with Unassigned presiding.

Case Details for State Of Oklahoma V. Ramsey Ray Harjo - Pif

Judge

Unassigned

Filing Date

August 06, 2013

Last Refreshed

June 10, 2022

Filing Location

Adair County, OK

Filing Court House

adair County

Case Events for State Of Oklahoma V. Ramsey Ray Harjo - Pif

Type Description
Docket Event VERIFICATION OF INCARCERATIONE FEES ($30.00 ASSESSED IN CM-13-151)
Docket Event ABSTRACT SENT TO D.P.S.
Docket Event ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT
Docket Event RECEIPT # 2015-88502 ON 04/08/2015. PAYOR:RAMSEY RAY HARJO TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $381.50. LINE ITEMS: TR-2013-423: $88.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $3.00 ON AC07 ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $50.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $9.00 ON AC11 CLEET PENALTY ASSESSMENT FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $100.00 ON AC14 FINES FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $5.00 ON AC21 AFIS FUND FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $5.00 ON AC22 SHERIFF'S SERVICE & INCARCERATION FEE FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $7.50 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $3.00 ON AC69 CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY FEE FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $20.00 ON AC71 DPS PATROL VEHICLE REVOLVING FUND FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $5.00 ON AC75 FORENSIC SCIENCE IMPROVEMENT ASSESSMENTS FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $10.00 ON AC77 DA COUNCIL PROSECUTION ASSESSMENT FEE FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $10.00 ON AC78 OKLAHOMA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH/TRAUMA CARE FUND FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $50.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY. TR-2013-423: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFF’S SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY FOR HARJO, RAMSEY RAY.
Docket Event AFIS FEE
Docket Event CLEET PENALTY ASSESSMENT
Docket Event SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE ON ARRESTS
Docket Event TRAUMA CARE ASSISTANCE REVOLVING FUND
Docket Event WARRANT RETURNED 4/8/2015, WARRANT ISSUED ON 10/16/2013, WARRANT SERVED ON 04/07/2015
Docket Event COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS
See all events