Contents

Details Case Events

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Oklahoma V. Robert Mcclure

Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Adair County, OK, . Adair County, OK Superior Courts adair County with BROWN, L presiding.

Case Details for State Of Oklahoma V. Robert Mcclure

Judge

BROWN, L

Filing Date

August 14, 2023

Last Refreshed

September 04, 2023

Filing Location

Adair County, OK

Filing Court House

adair County

Case Events for State Of Oklahoma V. Robert Mcclure

Type Description
Docket Event COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $25 COLLECTIONS
Docket Event BOND INITIAL FILING JAIL FUND FEE
Docket Event SURETY BOND FOR MCCLURE, ROBERT POSTED BY HARLIN, RANDY BRIAN (MULTICOUNTY AGENT:MERRILL BONDING ) (POWER NUMBER:56609 ), COUNT NUMBER 1, IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,000.00, POSTED 08/24/2023
Docket Event DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $25 COLLECTIONS
Docket Event WARRANT RETURNED 8/25/2023, WARRANT ISSUED ON 8/14/2023, WARRANT SERVED ON 08/24/2023
Docket Event WARRANT OF ARREST ISSUED, JUDGE: L. BROWN - BOND AMOUNT: $1,000.00 COUNT 1 - DISTURBING PEACE COMMENT:
Docket Event CRIMINAL MISDEMEANOR INITIAL FILING.
Docket Event OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BROWN, L. ELIZABETH TO THIS CASE.
Docket Event DEFENDANT ROBERT MCCLURE WAS CHARGED WITH COUNT #1, DISTURBING PEACE IN VIOLATION OF 21 O.S. 1362
Docket Event AFFIDAVIT FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT
See all events