Contents

Details Case Events

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Oklahoma V. Carroll Don Simmons

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Adair County, OK, . Adair County, OK Superior Courts adair County with Brown, L. Elizabeth presiding.

Case Details for State Of Oklahoma V. Carroll Don Simmons

Judge

Brown, L. Elizabeth

Filing Date

June 16, 2010

Last Refreshed

June 08, 2022

Filing Location

Adair County, OK

Filing Court House

adair County

Case Events for State Of Oklahoma V. Carroll Don Simmons

Type Description
Docket Event ADDITION OF 10% FOR WARRANT COLLECTION
Docket Event CASE SENT FOR COLLECTION. BATCH ID: 20200618-2735 - COLLECTION ID: 3101
Docket Event REDUCTION IN BENCH WARRANT FEE TO SHERIFF (10%)
Docket Event OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND
Docket Event CLERK'S BENCH WARRANT FEE {TITLE 22 O.S.966A}
Docket Event BENCH WARRANT ISSUED FAILED TO PAY, JUDGE: L. BROWN - BOND AMOUNT: $250.00 COUNT 1 - SEXUAL BATTERY COUNT 2 - LARCENY OF GASOLINE - PUMP PIRACY COMMENT:
Docket Event SHERIFF'S FUND - INMATE JAIL COSTS
Docket Event FAILURE TO PAY / FAILURE TO APPEAR - MINUTE - ORDER
Docket Event INSTALLMENT ORDER- $50 MO STARTING FEB 1
Docket Event WARRANT RETURNED 1/2/2020, WARRANT ISSUED ON 12/10/2018, WARRANT SERVED ON 01/02/2020
See all events