Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rocha, Manuel, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Trujillo, Tommy, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2009 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Under Submission Complete | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Under Submission | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | SC Judgment: Uncontested | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.