Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Simms, Dennis Michael, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Wright, Wanda, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2009 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | SC Judgment: Uncontested | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Voluntary Mediation | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Defendant's Claim & Order to Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.