Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brenner, Tammy M, filed a(n) Security Deposit (Sc) case against Franks, Charles F., represented by Todaro, David M, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County. This case was filed in Wayne County Superior Courts with VANSICKLE, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2015 |
CategorySecurity Deposit (Sc) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWayne County, OH |
|
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY ATTY TODARO
Date: February 24, 2015COUNTERCLAIM MAILED BY REGULAR MAIL EVIDENCED BY CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: April 21, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY
Date: February 24, 2015MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY ATTY TODARO
Date: March 10, 2015PAYMENT $15.00 RECEIPT #2015013443
Date: April 21, 2015JOURNAL ENTRY
Date: July 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | COUNTERCLAIM MAILED BY REGULAR MAIL EVIDENCED BY CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY DEFENDANT IN THE AMT OF $527.10 PLUS THE VALUE OF THE SECURITY DEPOSIT WITH INT AT 3% FROM NOVEMBER 5, 2014 FEE ASSESSED $15.00 | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $15.00 RECEIPT #2015013443 | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ON 3/31/15, BOTH PARTIES WERE PRESENT FOR MEDIATION...DEFT WAS PRESENT ALONG WITH HIS ATTY, DAVID TODARO...THE MEDIATION RESULTED IN NO AGREEMENT...THIS MATTER SHALL BE HEARD AT TRIAL ON 5/7/15, AT 1:30 P.M...THE TRIAL WILL TAKE PLACE AT THE WOOSTER BRANCH OF THE MUNICIPAL COURT...NOTIFY ALL PARTIES...IT IS SO ORDERED...JERRY S PACKARD, MAGISTRATE...COPIES TO PLTF, DEFT & ATTY TODARO | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | PLTF FILED A REQUEST WITH THE COURT THAT AN ATTY BE APPOINTED TO REPRESENT HER, AS SHE IS UNABLE TO FINANCIALLY RETAIN COUNSEL...AS THIS IS A CIVIL CASE, THE COURT HAS NO AUTHORITY TO APPOINT SUCH COUNSEL...THEREFORE, THE REQUST OF PLTF IS DENIED...JERRY S PACKARD, MAGISTRATE...COPIES TO PLTF AND ATTY | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MEDIATION HEARING SET FOR 05/07/2015 AT 1:30 PM IN C/ , JDG: PACKARD, JERRY S | |
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | THIS MATTER CAME ON FOR A MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY ATTY DAVID M TODARO, ACTING AS COUNSEL FOR CHARLES FRANKS...SAID MOTION IS WELL TAKEN AND IS HEREBY GRANTED...THE PARTIES' MEDIATION HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR MARCH 12, 2015, AT 10:15 A.M. IS HEREBY CONTINUED UNTIL TUESDAY, MARCH 31, 2015, AT 10:00 A.M...JERRY S PACKARD, MAGISTRATE...COPIES TO ATTY AND PLTF | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | MEDIATION HEARING SET FOR 03/31/2015 AT 10:00 AM IN SC/ , JDG: SMALL, CLAIMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.