Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Buzzelli, Russell A. filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, OH, . Wayne County, OH Superior Courts with Latecia E. Wiles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2011 |
CategoryAppeals Case |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationWayne County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE RETURNED AKRON C/A | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY: COURT APPT COUNSEL FEES APPROVED IN AMT OF $792.00 (FILED BY ATTY FOR FATHER T.D.) COPIES/ MAILED: W LANDERS C.H./ MAIL: JUVI COURT | |
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVT W/ ORDER FOR APPT COUNSEL W/ FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE (PER JE OF 4/23/2012) FILED BY ATTY WM LANDERS | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY ATTY WM LANDERS MOTION FOR FEES DENIED @ THIS TIME HE MAY RE-FILE HIS APPL FOR COURT APPT COUNSEL FEES & ATTCH A COMPLYING FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE/ AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY .... COPIES/ MAILED: W LANDERS | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION, ENTRY & CERTIFICATION FOR APPT COUNSEL FEES (FILED BY ATTY FOR APPELLEE) | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY: COURT APPT COUNSEL APPROVED IN AMT OF $1,000.00 (FILED BY ATTY FOR APPELLANT/ S.R.) COPIES/ MAILED: C OLSON C.H./ MAIL: JUVI COURT FOR PROCESSING | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTRA-ORDINARY FEES W/ MOTION, ENTRY & CERITIFCATION FOR APPT COUNSEL FEES (W/ ATTCHS) FILED BY ATTY FOR APPELLANT | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | DECISION & JOURNAL ENTRY: JUDGMENT OF THE WAYNE COUNTY JUVENILE COURT IS REVERSED & CAUSE REMANDED COPIES/ MAILED: R BUZZELLI, C OLSON, W LANDERS, D HUNTER C.H./ MAIL: L WILES, JUDGE LEISY, JUVI FILES | |
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF APPELLANT/ S.R. (MOTHER): CONRAD OLSON - (#0065388) | |
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION W/O ORAL ARGUMENT: COPIES/ MAILED: BUZZELI, LANDERS, OLSON, HUNTER C.H./ MAIL: WILES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.