Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mclp Asset Company Inc, Mclp Asset Company, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fornash, Ellen L., against Aka Lynda L. Steinhauer, Linda L. Steinhauer, State Of Ohio Department Of Taxation, Steinhauer, Linda L, Warren County Treasurer, Steinhauer, Ronald L, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with PEELER, ROBERT W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2023 |
CategoryForeclosures |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN FORECLOSURE WITHOUT PREJUDICE (JOURNAL BOOK 1362 PAGE 674) | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41 (A)(2) AND PROPOSED ORDER/ENTRY | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF STATE OF OHIO, DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE SUMMONS BY PERSONAL/RESIDENTIAL 9/5/23 ISSUED TO: STEINHAUER, RONALD L; PS SERVED BY GREENTREE LEGAL 9/11/23 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE SUMMONS BY PERSONAL/RESIDENTIAL 9/5/23 ISSUED TO: STEINHAUER, LINDA L; PS SERVED BY GREENTREE LEGAL 9/11/23 | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED 8/18/23 TO: STATE OF OHIO DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION: CM ON 8/25/23 BY ? | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED 8/18/23 TO: STEINHAUER, LINDA L: CM ON ? BY R? S? | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED 8/18/23 TO: STEINHAUER, RONALD L: CM ON ? BY R? S? | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF WARREN COUNTY TREASURER | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.