Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Thomas, Anthony W, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Pro Se, against 1St National Bank Of Lebanon Oh, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with PEELER, ROBERT W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER & ENTRY ADOPTING MAGISTRATE'S DECISION AS IF FULLY REWRITTEN HEREIN FINAL JUDGMENT ENTRY (JOURNAL BOOK 1358 PAGE 487) | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMET (SIC) | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FILINGS DATED SEPTEMBER 14, 2023 | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST OF RECORDS | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING- ( NO HEADING ) | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING- VA PAYMENT HISTORY | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING- SOCIAL SECURITY STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.